THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:11:33 PM
McKinnon, Maxine Elizabeth
CPSO#:
28797
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
09 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1865 Rogers Rd
Office #5
Perth ON K7H 0B2
Phone: (613)812-0455
Fax: (613)267-2526
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 15 Jun 1974 to 14 Jun 1975
Other - General Surgery
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Sep 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jan 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Jul 2009 |
|
Active |