THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:48:57 AM
Gay, Raymond James
CPSO#:
28708
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Aug 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 7
1848 Paris Street
Sudbury ON P3E 3C7
Phone: (705) 562 4502
Fax: (705) 674-2504
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAYMOND JAMES GAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GAY is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 07 Oct 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Dec 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 1976 |