THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 10:55:45 AM
Smith, William Gary
CPSO#:
28616
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Nov 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 1980
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. W. Gary Smith Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 21 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Timmins and District Hospital Medical Records
700 Ross Ave E
Timmins ON P4N 8P2
Date Received: 25 Nov 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:22 May 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Aug 1976 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 1977 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 1980 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Nov 2020 |