THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:04:05 PM
Sator-Kulic, Zehra Mustafa
CPSO#:
28605
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
11 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Jul 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Croatian, English
Education: University of Sarajevo, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Aug 1976 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 20 Nov 1979 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 1992 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1995 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |