THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 10:10:23 AM
Mason, Robin Liang Dominic
CPSO#:
28428
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
28 Mar 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jul 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Dr. Mason's medical records are being stored at:
Acne Treatment Clinic
Suite 412
4190 Finch Ave E.
Scarborough, ON
M1S 4T7
Alternative inquiries may be made at:
Acne Treatment Clinic
Suite 406
1366 Yonge St.
Toronto, ON
M4T 3A7
Date Received: 03 Apr 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jan 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jul 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 28 Mar 2013 |