THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 5:34:14 AM
Freedman, Morris
CPSO#:
28334
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Sep 1978
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Baycrest Centre For Geriatric Care
Kimel Family Building, Room 656
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2444
Fax: (416) 785-2484
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:24 Nov 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MORRIS FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 May 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 1978 |