THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 9:47:27 AM
Burns, Timothy James Robert
CPSO#:
28287
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Oct 2000
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
18 Oct 2000
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON N5R 5C4
Phone: (519) 631-2020
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:12 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JAMES ROBERT BURNS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BURNS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1976 to 30 Jun 1977
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Nov 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Oct 2000 |