THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 2:29:25 AM
Mussani, Yasmin
CPSO#:
28248
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Oct 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Arbor Trace Alzheimers Special Care
120 Chelton Rd
London ON N5M 0C9
Phone: (519) 681-0002
Fax: (519) 681-0004
Electoral District: 02
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YASMIN MUSSANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUSSANI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1976 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Oct 2019 |