THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:06:30 PM
Ford-Jones, Anthony Eric Andre
CPSO#:
28110
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
11 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Apr 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of London, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Ford-Jones Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:13 Mar 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 1973 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Nov 1975 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 12 Jan 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 May 2021 |