THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 21:20:21 PM
Gallie, Brenda Louise
CPSO#:
28022
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jan 1976
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Queen's University, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7403
Fax: 416 813 7040
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jewett Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 25 2021
Corporation Name: Brenda Gallie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 23 2023
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:05 Apr 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. BRENDA LOUISE GALLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GALLIE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 May 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1976 |