THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:44:00 PM
Paul, Margaret Ellen
CPSO#:
28020
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
06 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 1976
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Margaret Paul Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 8 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:J.E.Y.'S Business Record Storage
871 Jet Ave
North Bay ON P1B 2W9
Date Received: 24 Jan 2020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nunavut
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jul 1974 |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 1976 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 06 Jan 2020 |