THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 16:09:36 PM
Erez, Hanna Jafa
CPSO#:
27966
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
15 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
31 Aug 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Hanna Erez Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 3 2014
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Management Ltd.
13 - 1 High Meadow Pl
Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Tel: 1-800-775-0093
www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 12 Mar 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 1980 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Nov 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 1979 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 2019 |