THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:00:21 PM
de Guzman, Ruby
CPSO#:
27957
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
26 Mar 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Nov 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Filipino
Education: University of Santo Tomas Faculty of Med, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Formoso-de Guzman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2018
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1179 Plante Dr
Ottawa ON K1V 9E9
Date Received: 26 Mar 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:12 Nov 1992 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Mar 2018 |