THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 11:48:44 AM
Auchinachie, Keith Taylor
CPSO#:
27838
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
02 May 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
2-May-2021
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Keith Taylor Auchinachie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 11 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 1975 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 01 Mar 2008 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 01 Apr 2008 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 02 May 2021 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jan 2008
Summary:
On January 10, 2008, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Auchinachie to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
The Discipline Committee ordered the following:
1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Auchinachie(s certificate of registration for a period of two (2) months, one (1) month of which shall be suspended if Dr. Auchinachie successfully completes, at his own expense, the College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course and provides proof thereof to the College. Such suspension shall commence on March 1, 2008. The College(s Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course shall be completed by no later than April 30, 2008 and the second month of suspension shall be served on a date to be set by the Registrar if proof of the successful completion of the course is not provided.
2. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Auchinachie to appear before the Panel to be reprimanded.
3. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Auchinachie to pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00.
4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jan 10, 2008
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: June 27, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)