THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 15:13:32 PM
Sexton, Patrick Hugh
CPSO#:
27757
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Aug 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Patrick H. Sexton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2011
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
RSRS
111 St. Regis Crescent South
Toronto ON M3J 1Y6
416.398.0638 or 1.888.563.3732 Fax: 877.398.5932
Date Received: 28 Aug 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Aug 1975 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Oct 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 1986 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 1989 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 1991 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2012 |