Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Sep 1992
Summary:
In September 1992, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Artinian guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he falsified a record in respect of the examination or treatment of a patient, contrary to s. 27(16); in that he knowingly submitted a false or misleading account or false or misleading charges for services rendered to a patient, contrary to s. 27(17); in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Artinian's licence to practice be revoked.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1993-10-14
Hearing Date(s): 29 Apr 1991
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Apr 1988
Summary:
In April 1988, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Artinian guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the records that are required to be kept respecting his patients, contrary to s. 27(3); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32). Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Artinian be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee further ruled that the Doctor be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of twenty-seven months. It was stipulated, however, that the final twenty-four months of this period of suspension would themselves be suspended, provided that Dr. Artinian, before the end of his first three months of suspension, had submitted to the reprimand, had paid the fine, and had cooperated in investigations of his practice of the kind provided for under s. 64 of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, such inspections to take place commencing at the end of the first nine months following the commencement of Dr. Artinian's twenty-seven month suspension, and to occur thereafter at the end of each succeeding six months during the remainder of the said suspension.
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 1990-06-26
Hearing Date(s): 18 Apr 1988