THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 0:54:08 AM
Ryan, Edward Anthony Joseph
CPSO#:
27400
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
18 Sep 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 May 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
18-Sep-2023
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jun 1975 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 03 Jul 2019 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 May 2021 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 18 Sep 2023 |