THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 13:03:42 PM
Porter, Richard Edgar Allan
CPSO#:
27389
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Richard Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 20 2016
Corporation Name: R.E.A. Porter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 24 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: August 31, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Richard Edgar Allan Porter to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 31, 2020:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Porter engaged in professional misconduct or is incompetent. In the face of this investigation, effective August 31, 2020 Dr. Porter agreed to resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)