THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 8:47:36 AM
Devlin, Samuel Rueben
CPSO#:
27383
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
08 Jun 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
8-Jun-2020
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:1235 Wilson Ave.
Toronto, Ontario
M3M 0B2
Date Received: 24 Apr 2020
Instructions/Address:1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Date Received: 23 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:17 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 08 Jun 2020 |