THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 21:32:24 PM
Wong, Godfrey Long
CPSO#:
27378
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Dec 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: G. L. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For medical record requests, call 416-297-8624 or 905-513-7518.
Date Received: 13 Apr 2023
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 31, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Godfrey Long Wong to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 31, 2022:
Effective December 31, 2022, Dr. Wong has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)