THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:18:26 PM
Wolman, Stephen Laurie
CPSO#:
27356
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Jun 1975
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Jun 1975
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
9N979
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3507
Fax: (416) 340-4785
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen L. Wolman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 27 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:14 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:27 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEPHEN LAURIE WOLMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WOLMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jun 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jun 1975 |