THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 1:29:04 AM
Saginur, Raphael
CPSO#:
27277
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
01 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jan 1983
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Raphael Saginur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 11 2019
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:For patients of the Ottawa Hospital:
613-798-5555 ext. 18720
For patients of the Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre:
807-737-2877 ext. 4753
Date Received: 17 Sep 2018
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Nov 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Medical Microbiology |
Effective:10 Dec 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1983 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jan 2019 |