THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 4:35:09 AM
Wong, George Kam Kwong
CPSO#:
27176
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
08 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical Sch, 1971
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2464 Howard Ave, Suite 201
Windsor ON N8X3V6
Phone: (519)9776643
Fax: (519)9156326
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. George K. K. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 9 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:11 Nov 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jan 1975 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 Jul 1996 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Jun 2022 |