THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 2:31:13 AM
De Bosset, Philippe
CPSO#:
26799
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Feb 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Jan 1977
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Lausanne, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
111 St. Regis Crescent S.
Toronto, ON
M3J 1Y6
Tel: (416) 398-0638
Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732
Fax: (416) 398-5932
Website: www.rsrs.com
For files created after June 2006, patients can contact the College for more information regarding where to find there medical records.
Date Received: 19 Feb 2013
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:25 Mar 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:18 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 07 Jun 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 1977 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Feb 2013 |