THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 11:23:59 AM
Jackson, Randall Jeffrey Denton
CPSO#:
26723
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
18 Apr 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Apr 2020
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Lanark county mental health
142-179 Elmsley St N
Smiths Falls ON K7A 2H8
Date Received: 02 May 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:09 Jun 1987 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2020 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Apr 2023 |