THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 12:43:43 PM
Pollett, Judith Anne Whittaker
CPSO#:
26710
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Aug 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Free University of Berlin, 1969
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking a copy of their medical records may send a written request to:
Pain Care Clinics
Unit 2 - 6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON L5N 6B8
Date Received: 14 Dec 2018
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nova Scotia
USA - Florida
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:22 Nov 1982 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 Sep 1981 to 16 Oct 1981
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 03 May 1982 to 04 Jul 1982
EL - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1982 to 01 Oct 1982
EL - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 1975 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 May 1982 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Feb 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |