THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 18:15:19 PM
Casper, Robert Fredric Joseph
CPSO#:
26688
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Jan 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Jan 1984
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1101
655 Bay Street
Toronto ON M5G 2K4
Phone: (416) 506-0804 Ext. 3232
Fax: (416) 972-0036
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:01 Jan 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROBERT FREDRIC JOSEPH CASPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASPER is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 May 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 18 Aug 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Jan 1984 |