THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:11:25 AM
Gall, James Murray
CPSO#:
26677
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of
02 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
03 Feb 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jim Gall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 14 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Jul 1975 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 11 Sep 1978 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2020 |