THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 9:00:12 AM
Teitel, Jerome Mark
CPSO#:
26627
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Jun 1981
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Jun 1981
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5128
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:17 Nov 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:20 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JEROME MARK TEITEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TEITEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 15 Jun 1977 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 1981 |