THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 8:00:28 AM
Peters, Walter Joseph
CPSO#:
26346
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Feb 1974
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:RSRS Medical Records Storage
111 St Regis Crescent S
North York, ON M3J 1Y6
or
[email protected]
or
1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 24 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:15 Apr 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 1974 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2019 |