THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
13/05/24 3:30:54 AM
Love Jones, Helen
CPSO#:
26095
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Sep 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Cole, Helen Love (used until: 11 Jun 1996 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Welsh National School of Medicine, 1959
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:05 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 1973 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jun 2006 |