THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:07:56 AM
Williams, Olive Joyce
CPSO#:
26021
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Boyce, Olive Joyce (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of West Indies, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Olive J Williams Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 8 2010
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:25 Mar 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Pathology |
Effective:21 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2011 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: May 28, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Williams has ceased to practise pathology in Ontario and will not recommence the practice of pathology in Ontario in any capacity until she has provided notice in writing to the College of her intention to do so at least 30 days prior to the date upon which she is scheduled to recommence the practice of pathology. Should she return to the practice of pathology, she will be required to complete an educational program acceptable to the College and her practice will be subject to supervision for one year, followed by an assessment.