THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 7:04:11 AM
Barnabe, Patrick
CPSO#:
25954
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
02 Jan 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Jul 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: University of Ottawa, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:785 Meech Rd
Chelsea, Quebec J9B 1H9
Date Received: 02 Jan 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 12 Jul 2019 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 02 Jan 2020 |
Concerns
Source:
QA Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Patrick Barnabe to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 12, 2019:
Concerns have been identified with respect to Dr. Barnabe’s practice. As a result:
• Dr. Barnabe has agreed to resign from the College effective January 2, 2020 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
• Dr. Barnabe will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College until January 2, 2020.