THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:03:05 AM
Callaghan, William Bryan
CPSO#:
25792
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Jul 1973
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Sep 1979
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: W. Bryan Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 27 2021
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking access to their medical records can contact Docudavit Solutions:1-888-782-9083 or fax 416-398-5932
Date Received: 16 Apr 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital |
Carleton Place |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Plastic Surgery |
Effective:26 Nov 1979 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WILLIAM BRYAN CALLAGHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CALLAGHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 08 Sep 1976 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 1979 |