THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 7:38:18 AM
Hurwitz, Jeffrey Jay
CPSO#:
25791
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of
04 Feb 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Jul 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Date of Death:
4-Feb-2022
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jeffrey Hurwitz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:01 Apr 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 1973 |
Expired: Member deceased. |
Expiry date: 04 Feb 2022 |