THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 12:35:33 PM
Pigeon, Michel Bernard Joseph
CPSO#:
25683
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Mar 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Dec 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Effective March 1, 2020
Waypoint Mental Health Centre
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene, ON
L9M 1G3
1-705-549-3181
Date Received: 29 Jan 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:15 Mar 1978 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 1996 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 1 - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jun 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 1973 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 08 Jun 1981 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Mar 2020 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Fitness to Practice
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1981
Summary:
On June 8, 1981, the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Pigeon to be incapacitated and issued an order. On December 14, 2007, the Fitness to Practise Committee released Dr. Pigeon from the order of June 8, 1981.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jun 1981