THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 17:20:25 PM
Cordy, Peter Edward
CPSO#:
25585
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
06 Jun 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1967
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Peter Cordy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 23 2011
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Box 655 Whistler, BC V0N 1B0
Date Received: 05 May 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:02 Nov 1972 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jun 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |