THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 18:21:32 PM
Sira, Surjeet Singh
CPSO#:
25354
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
17 Jan 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Italian, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: University of Birmingham, 1963
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to request copies of their medical records may contact Record Storage and Retrieval Services: 1-888-563-3732 ext. 1
Date Received: 17 May 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:29 Mar 1977 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 1972 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jul 1972 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Nov 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Quality Assurance Committee |
Effective: 17 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 17 Jan 2017 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: March 2, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Surjeet Singh Sira to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 2, 2017:
Dr. Sira resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction in Canada.
Download Full Document (PDF)