THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 1:29:07 AM
Canning, Aidan William Noel
CPSO#:
25353
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
07 Nov 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: National University of Ireland, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Aidan Canning Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Mar 1972 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 1972 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2018 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 07 Nov 2018 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: November 7, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Aidan William Noel Canning to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 7, 2018:
Dr. Canning has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in any jurisdiction and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.