THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:05:34 AM
Craigie, Elizabeth
CPSO#:
25290
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
23 Jul 1984
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Aug 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 20 Nov 1974 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jan 1981 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 04 Jun 1982 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 23 Jul 1984 |