THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 5:41:35 AM
Ter Brugge, Karel Gerard
CPSO#:
25048
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: State University of Utrecht, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Karel G. Ter Brugge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 28 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:06 Nov 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jul 2022 |
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On February 16th, 2023, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Karel ter Brugge in respect of an incidents that took place in 2014 and 2015.