THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 1:55:37 AM
Cherrie, Kenneth Urban
CPSO#:
25018
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
26 Oct 1990
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: National University of Ireland, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Nov 1968 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 26 Oct 1990 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 07 Aug 1990
Summary:
In August 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cherrie guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(32) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cherrie be reprimanded, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of two months. This suspension was to commence immediately upon the expiration of the six-month suspension period referred to in the Notice of Suspension previously directed to Dr. Cherrie, dated 10 July 1990. The Committee further ordered that Dr. Cherrie attend before the Discipline Committee for his reprimand on a date to be set by the Registrar prior to the expiry of the above suspension period. If Dr. Cherrie failed to attend for this reprimand, then the suspension of his licence would continue indefinitely, until such time as the reprimand was administered to him.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 07 Aug 1990
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Jun 1990
Summary:
In June 1990, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Cherrie guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 27(27) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to provide within a reasonable time and without cause a report or certificate requested by a patient or his authorized agent in respect of an examination or treatment performed by him. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Cherrie be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register. The Committee also ruled that he be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his licence to practice be suspended upon this Order becoming final, such suspension to continue for six months beyond the date upon which the fine was paid.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 08 Jun 1990