THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 22:34:48 PM
Johnson, David
CPSO#:
25017
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1995
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1966
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: David Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2007
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients seeking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact the following locations:
Pioneer Ridge Long-Term Care Home
750 Tungsten Street
Thunder Bay, Ontario
P7A 5C2
Hogarth Riverview Manor Long Term-Care Home
300 Lillie Street
Thunder Bay, Ontario
P7C 4Y7
Date Received: 01 Jun 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2022 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 19 Jun 1995
Summary:
In June 1995, Dr. Johnson pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 29(30) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient.
The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found Dr. Johnson guilty of professional misconduct.
Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
1. Dr. Johnson's licence to practice was to be suspended for a period of 120 days.
The final sixty days of this suspension, however, were themselves to be suspended provided that he fulfilled the following conditions:
(a) Dr. Johnson was, at his own expense, to attend upon a psychiatrist acceptable to the Registrar and complete such treatment in boundary and related issues as the psychiatrist considered necessary, to the satisfaction of the Registrar.
In addition, Dr. Johnson, at his own expense, was to attend upon the psychiatrist not less than 22 months and not more than 24 months following the date of completion of the above-mentioned treatment for a re assessment of his psychiatric health as it related to this matter.
This re-assessment was to be to the satisfaction of the Registrar.
Dr. Johnson was to consent to and direct the psychiatrist to report in writing to the Registrar concerning the results of both the initial treatment and the re-assessment, which reports were to be satisfactory to the Registrar.
(b) Dr. Johnson through his counsel was to express remorse for his actions and apologize to the complainant.
(c) Dr. Johnson was to have a third party present during the examination of all female patients, unless the patient objected.
(d) Dr. Johnson was to have no contact with the complainant, except during the conduct of professional duties.
(e) Dr. Johnson was to post an irrevocable letter of credit in favour of the College in the amount of $10,000.00 for a five-year period in respect of the complainant's therapy costs.
2. Dr. Johnson was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register.
The Committee also recommended that the Doctor's name be published.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 19, 1995