THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:59:02 PM
Wales, Roger Cyril
CPSO#:
24849
MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of
03 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
22 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of London, 1961
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1972 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 15 Aug 1988 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 1988 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 22 May 2012 |
Revoked: Discipline Committee. |
Effective: 03 Aug 2017 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 14 Jan 2015
Summary:
On January 14, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Roger Cyril Wales committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Wales is incompetent.
Dr. Wales is a General Practitioner (GP) refractionist in solo practice in the Kingston area.
The findings of professional misconduct and incompetence pertain to the following areas of Dr. Wales’ practice:
- his measuring intraocular pressure by touching the eye with his finger (finger tonometry) instead of using an applanation tonometer to measure numerically;
- his failure to measure intraocular pressure in certain age groups (under 40);
- his failure to dilate pupils to look at the fundus/posterior eye; and
- his failure to use cycloplegia in children to obtain proper refraction.
Dr. Wales’ deficiencies in his care and treatment of patients demonstrated a lack of knowledge, skill, and judgment of such a nature and to an extent that he is unfit to continue to practise or that his practice should be restricted. The Committee found that the deficiencies Dr. Wales displays are current.
Disposition
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:
- the Registrar revoke Dr. Wales’ certificate of registration effective immediately;
- Dr. Wales appear before the Committee to be reprimanded within thirty (30) days of the date this Order becomes final; and
- Dr. Wales pay costs to the College in the amount of $23,340.00 within thirty (30) days of the date this Order becomes final.
Appeal
On February 11, 2015 and September 1, 2017, Dr. Wales appealed the decision on finding and the decision on penalty of the Discipline Committee to the Superior Court of Justice (Divisional Court). Pursuant to s.71 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, the Discipline Committee’s decision remained in effect despite the appeal. On September 6, 2018, the Divisional Court dismissed for delay the appeal, with costs fixed at $750.00.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: September 6, 2018
Hearing Date(s): Hearing dates: January 27-31, 2014
Penalty Hearing dates: April 24, 26, 27, 2017
Reprimand: June 21, 2019 at 12:30 p.m.