THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:25:34 AM
Latour, Anne Helen
CPSO#:
24453
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
20 Nov 1997
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
27 Jun 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Lewandowski, Anne Helen Latour (used until: 11 Jan 1983 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:07 Nov 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Nov 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jun 1991 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 20 Nov 1997 |