THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 18:15:36 PM
Ford, Jacqueline
CPSO#:
24427
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
13 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Feb 1972
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 201 60 Hatt Street
Dundas, ON L9H 7T6
Date Received: 13 Aug 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:24 Nov 1981 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 1969 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 1970 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Feb 1972 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2014 |