THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:23:51 PM
Tan, Kim-Weng
CPSO#:
24005
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Aug 1970
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Aug 1970
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin, 1965
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Record Storage & Retrieval Services
111 St. Regis Street South
North York ON M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 25 Jan 2017
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:19 Nov 1971 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIM-WENG TAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 1967 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Aug 1970 |