THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 11:58:26 AM
Roth, Sherryn Naomi
CPSO#:
23948
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 1971
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 1971
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1970
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Heart Function Clinic and Rapid Car
Unit A2
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 2484
Fax: 4162250026
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiology |
Effective:01 Jan 1975 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:01 Jan 1976 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHERRYN NAOMI ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Jun 1971 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 17 Jun 1972 |