THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:32:03 AM
Rigg, Wesley Donald
CPSO#:
23865
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
24 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
23 Jan 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Melbourne Faculty of Medic, 1968
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Suite 3
55 Hampden Road
Nedlands WA 6009
Australia
Date Received: 24 Jun 2014
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:20 Nov 1974 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1969 to 14 Jun 1970
Other - Rotating Internship
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jun 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jul 1970 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1971 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 1995 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 24 Jun 2014 |