THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 21:03:38 PM
Nurse, William Ewart
CPSO#:
23859
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
19 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 May 2001
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Irish Conjoint Board, 1962
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 1969 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 1971 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2001 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 07 May 2010 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 19 Aug 2020 |